Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/08/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 09/07/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 09/29/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/03/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/11/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 10/25/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/03/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 12/08/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 03/19/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/19/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/06/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 09/12/2012