Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/13/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/26/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 08/01/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/09/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/09/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/12/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/14/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/20/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/21/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/22/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/23/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/23/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 10/03/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/03/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/04/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/06/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 10/06/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 10/12/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/13/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/24/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/25/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/26/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/31/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/01/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 11/10/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 11/10/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/25/2011