Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/19/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/23/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/23/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/07/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/01/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 11/04/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/27/2012