Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/08/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/19/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/09/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/15/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/23/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/03/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 10/12/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/24/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/29/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/29/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/29/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/14/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/24/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/16/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/16/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/16/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/20/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/20/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/20/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/28/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 03/28/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/29/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 04/24/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/17/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/21/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 06/29/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/11/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/17/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/19/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/19/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/24/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/24/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/25/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 08/01/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 08/02/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/02/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/10/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 09/19/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/19/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/28/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/28/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/16/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/13/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/13/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/27/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/21/2012