Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 07/13/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/22/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/05/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/01/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 06/21/2012