Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/13/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 07/14/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/19/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/21/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/25/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 08/01/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 08/05/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 08/26/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 08/26/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 08/26/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 08/26/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 08/26/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/06/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/06/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/06/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/06/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 09/08/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/08/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/08/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/09/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/20/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/03/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 02/08/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/08/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 06/19/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/19/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/19/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 06/19/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/21/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/29/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/12/2012