Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/13/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/13/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/13/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/20/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 08/01/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 08/01/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 08/09/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 08/23/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/08/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/14/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/23/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/29/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/25/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/26/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/14/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/14/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/14/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/16/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/30/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/06/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/07/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/08/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/12/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 12/13/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/14/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/15/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/06/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/17/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/17/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/17/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/17/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/23/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 01/23/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 01/27/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/31/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 01/31/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/06/2012
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/27/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/27/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/27/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/28/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 03/09/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/16/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/25/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/25/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/09/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/15/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/22/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/22/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/06/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/06/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/18/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/18/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/18/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/26/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/26/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/26/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/09/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/17/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/17/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/31/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/10/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 09/10/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 09/21/2012