There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Equal Access and Parity for Multi-Campus Hospitals Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend titles XVIII and XIX of the Social Security Act to clarify the application of EHR payment incentives in cases of multi-campus hospitals.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/12/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
07/20/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
07/15/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/12/2011Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/12/2011Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/12/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (74)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 07/12/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/12/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/12/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 07/12/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/22/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/22/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/22/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/22/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/22/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/22/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/22/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 07/22/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/28/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/28/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/28/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/29/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/13/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/13/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/15/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/04/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/12/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/18/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/30/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/08/2011

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means07/12/2011 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health07/20/2011 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce07/12/2011 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health07/15/2011 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2500.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2500. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/12/2011)

Equal Access and Parity for Multi-Campus Hospitals Act - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act (SSA), with respect to payments to hospitals for inpatient hospital services, to prescribe a special rule for applying Medicare electronic health record (EHR) incentive payments, at the election of a qualified main hospital, to its remote inpatient locations.

Prohibits administrative or judicial review of: (1) the methodology and standards for determining a remote inpatient location, a qualified remote inpatient location, a component facility, a qualified component facility, a main provider, and a qualified main provider, and which such locations, facilities, and providers are qualified; and (2) the methodology and standards for the election in connection with such special rule.

Amends SSA title XIX (Medicaid) to set forth a special rule for applying Medicaid EHR incentive payments, at the election of a qualified main hospital, to its remote locations.