Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 07/12/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/12/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/12/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 07/12/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/22/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/22/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/22/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/22/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/22/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/22/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/22/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 07/22/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/28/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/28/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/28/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/29/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/13/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/13/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/15/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/04/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/12/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/18/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/30/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/08/2011