Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/12/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/12/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/12/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/13/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/13/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/28/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/28/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/28/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/28/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/28/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/20/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/20/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/20/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/20/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 09/20/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/20/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/20/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/04/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/20/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 01/31/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/31/2012