Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 07/13/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/14/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/19/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 07/20/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/20/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/21/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/21/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/21/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/26/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/29/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 08/01/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/07/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/07/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/07/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/07/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 09/07/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 09/08/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/08/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 09/08/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 09/08/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/08/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 09/08/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/08/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/08/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/09/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/12/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/14/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/15/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 09/15/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 09/20/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/21/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/21/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/21/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/22/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/22/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/03/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 10/03/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 10/05/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 10/06/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 10/11/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/11/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/12/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/13/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 10/25/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 10/27/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/27/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 11/03/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/15/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 11/17/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 11/18/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 12/02/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/13/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/14/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 01/17/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/17/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 01/17/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/23/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 01/25/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/19/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/19/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/07/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/15/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/25/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/18/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/12/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/18/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/28/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/16/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/15/2012