Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/13/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/13/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/13/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/13/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/07/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/12/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/22/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/12/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/08/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/20/2012