Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/13/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/25/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/25/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/29/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/29/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 08/12/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 08/16/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/09/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/14/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/25/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/23/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/27/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/24/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/16/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/09/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/15/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/05/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/24/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/25/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 07/25/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/30/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 08/02/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 08/02/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 08/03/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 08/03/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/10/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/10/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/10/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/13/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/28/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/15/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/28/2012