Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/22/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/14/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/15/2012