There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to provide for increased flexibility in establishing rates for reimbursement of State homes by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs for nursing home care provided to veterans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/14/2011Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
07/28/2011Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
07/28/2011Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
07/25/2011Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
07/22/2011Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/14/2011Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/14/2011Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/20/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/20/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/20/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/20/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 07/20/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/20/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 07/20/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/20/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/20/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/20/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/20/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/20/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/25/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/25/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/25/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/27/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/27/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/27/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/27/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/27/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/29/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/29/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/29/2011
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/29/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/29/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/29/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/29/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 08/05/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/05/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 08/05/2011
Rep. Rodgers, Cathy McMorris [R-WA-5] 08/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/19/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 08/19/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/06/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/06/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/06/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 09/12/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 09/15/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/21/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/21/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/08/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/13/2012

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs07/14/2011 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health07/22/2011 Referred to
07/25/2011 Hearings by
07/28/2011 Markup by
07/28/2011 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.2530.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2530. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/14/2011)

Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to enter into a contract or agreement with each state home to pay for nursing home care provided in the home to certain veterans with service-connected disabilities.

Requires such payment to be based on a methodology, developed by the Secretary in consultation with the home state, to adequately reimburse the state home for the care provided under such contract or agreement. (Current law requires payment at the lesser of the prevailing rate in the geographic area for non-VA nursing homes or the daily cost of care, both of which are determined by the Secretary.)