Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/20/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/20/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/20/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/20/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 07/20/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/20/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 07/20/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/20/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/20/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/20/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/20/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/20/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/25/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/25/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/25/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/27/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/27/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/27/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/27/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/27/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/29/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/29/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/29/2011
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/29/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/29/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/29/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/29/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 08/05/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/05/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 08/05/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 08/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/19/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 08/19/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/06/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/06/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/06/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 09/12/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 09/15/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/21/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/21/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/08/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/13/2012