Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 07/14/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 07/30/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/27/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/16/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 11/18/2011