Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/22/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/22/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/22/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/28/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/28/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/28/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/28/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/28/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 08/05/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 08/05/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 08/05/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 08/05/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/05/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/29/2012