Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/15/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/15/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/15/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/25/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/25/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/26/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/26/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/26/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/26/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/28/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/28/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 08/01/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 08/05/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 08/09/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 08/09/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 08/19/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/30/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/12/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/13/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/20/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 10/06/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/01/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/08/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/15/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/07/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 03/22/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/16/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/16/2012