Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/19/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/19/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/19/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/19/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/28/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 07/28/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/05/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/13/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/25/2012