Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/14/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/14/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 07/14/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 07/14/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/14/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/21/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/28/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/28/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/08/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/08/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/04/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/08/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/08/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 01/17/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/20/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/17/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/12/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/19/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/19/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/26/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/26/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/13/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/19/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/13/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/15/2012