Text: H.R.2553 — 112th Congress (2011-2012)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 112-27 (08/05/2011)

 
[112th Congress Public Law 27]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 269]]

                    AIRPORT AND AIRWAY EXTENSION ACT 
                            OF 2011, PART IV

[[Page 125 STAT. 270]]

Public Law 112-27
112th Congress

                                 An Act


 
  To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the funding and 
  expenditure authority of the Airport and Airway Trust Fund, to amend 
title 49, United States Code, to extend the airport improvement program, 
     and for other purposes. <<NOTE: Aug. 5, 2011 -  [H.R. 2553]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress <<NOTE: Airport and Airway 
Extension Act of 2011, Part IV. 26 USC 1 note.>> assembled,
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Airport and Airway Extension Act of 
2011, Part IV''.
SEC. 2. EXTENSION OF TAXES FUNDING AIRPORT AND AIRWAY TRUST FUND.

    (a) Fuel Taxes.--Subparagraph (B) of section 4081(d)(2) of the 
Internal Revenue Code of 1986 <<NOTE: 26 USC 4081.>>  is amended by 
striking ``July 22, 2011'' and inserting ``September 16, 2011''.

    (b) Ticket Taxes.--
            (1) Persons.--Clause (ii) of section 4261(j)(1)(A) of the 
        Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by striking ``July 22, 
        2011'' and inserting ``September 16, 2011''.
            (2) Property.--Clause (ii) of section 4271(d)(1)(A) of such 
        Code is amended by striking ``July 22, 2011'' and inserting 
        ``September 16, 2011''.

    (c) <<NOTE: 26 USC 4081 note.>>  Effective Date.--The amendments 
made by this section shall take effect on July 23, 2011.
SEC. 3. EXTENSION OF AIRPORT AND AIRWAY TRUST FUND EXPENDITURE 
                    AUTHORITY.

    (a) In General.--Paragraph (1) of section 9502(d) of the Internal 
Revenue Code of 1986 is amended--
            (1) by striking ``July 23, 2011'' and inserting ``September 
        17, 2011''; and
            (2) by inserting ``or the Airport and Airway Extension Act 
        of 2011, Part IV'' before the semicolon at the end of 
        subparagraph (A).

    (b) Conforming Amendment.--Paragraph (2) of section 9502(e) of such 
Code is amended by striking ``July 23, 2011'' and inserting ``September 
17, 2011''.
    (c) <<NOTE: 26 USC 9502 note.>>  Effective Date.--The amendments 
made by this section shall take effect on July 23, 2011.
SEC. 4. EXTENSION OF AIRPORT IMPROVEMENT PROGRAM.

    (a) Authorization of Appropriations.--
            (1) In general.--Section 48103 of title 49, United States 
        Code, is amended by striking paragraph (8) and inserting the 
        following:

[[Page 125 STAT. 271]]

            ``(8) <<NOTE: Time period.>>  $3,380,178,082 for the period 
        beginning on October 1, 2010, and ending on September 16, 
        2011.''.
            (2) Obligation of amounts.--Subject to limitations specified 
        in advance in appropriation Acts, sums made available pursuant 
        to the amendment made by paragraph (1) may be obligated at any 
        time through September 30, 2011, and shall remain available 
        until expended.

    (b) Project Grant Authority.--Section 47104(c) <<NOTE: 49 USC 
47104.>>  of such title is amended by striking ``July 22, 2011,'' and 
inserting ``September 16, 2011,''.
SEC. 5. EXTENSION OF EXPIRING AUTHORITIES.

    (a) Section 40117(l)(7) of title 49, United States Code, is amended 
by striking ``July 23, 2011.'' and inserting ``September 17, 2011.''.
    (b) Section 44302(f)(1) of such title is amended--
            (1) by striking ``July 22, 2011,'' and inserting ``September 
        16, 2011,''; and
            (2) by striking ``October 31, 2011,'' and inserting 
        ``December 31, 2011,''.

    (c) Section 44303(b) of such title is amended by striking ``October 
31, 2011,'' and inserting ``December 31, 2011,''.
    (d) Section 47107(s)(3) of such title is amended by striking ``July 
23, 2011.'' and inserting ``September 17, 2011.''.
    (e) Section 47115(j) of such title is amended by striking ``July 23, 
2011,'' and inserting ``September 17, 2011,''.
    (f) Section 47141(f) of such title is amended by striking ``July 22, 
2011.'' and inserting ``September 16, 2011.''.
    (g) Section 49108 of such title is amended by striking ``July 22, 
2011,'' and inserting ``September 16, 2011,''.
    (h) Section 161 of the Vision 100--Century of Aviation 
Reauthorization Act (49 U.S.C. 47109 note) is amended by striking ``July 
23, 2011,'' and inserting ``September 17, 2011,''.
    (i) Section 186(d) of such Act (117 Stat. 2518) is amended by 
striking ``July 23, 2011,'' and inserting ``September 17, 2011,''.
    (j) <<NOTE: 49 USC 40117 note.>>  The amendments made by this 
section shall take effect on July 23, 2011.
SEC. 6. ESSENTIAL AIR SERVICE REFORM.

    (a) In General.--Section 41731(a)(1) of title 49, United States 
Code, is amended--
            (1) in subparagraph (A) by redesignating clauses (i) through 
        (iii) as subclauses (I) through (III), respectively;
            (2) by redesignating subparagraphs (A) and (B) as clauses 
        (i) and (ii), respectively;
            (3) in clause (i)(I) (as so redesignated) by inserting 
        ``(A)'' before ``(i)(I)'';
            (4) in subparagraph (A)(ii) (as so redesignated)--
                    (A) by striking ``determined'' and inserting ``was 
                determined'';
                    (B) by striking ``Secretary'' and inserting 
                ``Secretary of Transportation''; and
                    (C) by striking the period at the end and inserting 
                a semicolon; and
            (5) by adding at the end the following:
                    ``(B) is located not less than 90 miles from the 
                nearest medium or large hub airport; and

[[Page 125 STAT. 272]]

                    ``(C) had an average subsidy per passenger of less 
                than $1,000 during the most recent fiscal year, as 
                determined by the Secretary.''.

    (b) Limitation on Authority To Decide a Place Not an Eligible 
Place.--Section 41731(b) of such title is amended--
            (1) by striking ``Secretary of Transportation'' and 
        inserting ``Secretary''; and
            (2) by striking ``on the basis of a passenger subsidy at 
        that place or on another basis'' and inserting ``on any basis''.

    (c) Exceptions and Waivers.--Section 41731 of such title is amended 
by adding at the end the following:
    ``(c) Exceptions for Locations in Alaska.--Subsections (a)(1)(B) and 
(a)(1)(C) shall not apply with respect to a location in the State of 
Alaska.
    ``(d) Waivers.--The Secretary may waive subsection (a)(1)(B) with 
respect to a location if the Secretary determines that the geographic 
characteristics of the location result in undue difficulty in accessing 
the nearest medium or large hub airport.''.

    Approved August 5, 2011.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 2553:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 157 (2011):
            July 20, considered and passed House.
            Aug. 5, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>

Share This Section