Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law (08/05/2011)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

Airport and Airway Extension Act of 2011, Part IV - (Sec. 2) Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend through September 16, 2011, increased excise taxes on aviation fuels, the excise tax on air transportation of persons and property, and the expenditure authority for the Airport and Airway Trust Fund.

(Sec. 4) Increases the authorization of appropriations for the period beginning on October 1, 2010, and ending on September 16, 2011, for airport planning and development and noise compatibility planning projects (known as airport improvement projects [AIPs]). Extends through September 16, 2011, the authority of the Secretary of Transportation to make new AIP grants.

(Sec. 5) Extends until September 17, 2011: (1) the pilot program for passenger facility fee authorizations at non-hub airports, and (2) disclosure requirements for large and medium hub airports applying for AIP grants.

Directs the Secretary to extend through September 16, 2011, the termination date of insurance coverage for domestic or foreign-flag aircraft. Grants the Secretary discretionary authority to further extend such coverage through December 31, 2011. Extends through December 31, 2011, the authority of the Secretary to limit air carrier liability for claims arising out of acts of terrorism.

Extends through September 16, 2011: (1) grant eligibility for airports located in the Marshall Islands, Micronesia, and Palau; (2) grants to state and local governments for land use compatibility AIPs; and (3) authority for approving an application of the Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority for an airport development grant or for permission to impose a passenger facility fee.

Amends the Vision 100 - Century of Aviation Reauthorization Act to extend through September 16, 2011: (1) the temporary increase to 95% of the federal government's share of certain AIP costs, and (2) funding for airport development at Midway Island Airport.

(Sec. 6) Revises essential air service (EAS) program eligibility requirements to limit such service to airports (except those in Alaska) that: (1) are located at least 90 miles from the nearest medium or large hub airport, and (2) had an average subisdy per passenger of less than $1,000. Authorizes the Secretary of Transportation to waive such requirements for a particular location if its geographic characteristics result in undue difficulty in accessing the nearest medium or large hub airport.