Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/22/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/28/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/28/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/15/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 09/15/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 09/15/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 09/23/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/23/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/23/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 10/05/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/13/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/27/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/02/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/02/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 11/15/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/12/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/16/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/29/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/29/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/12/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/12/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/12/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/19/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/19/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/19/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/19/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 08/02/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/10/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/10/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 09/19/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/21/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/09/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/16/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/14/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/28/2012