Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 07/19/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/28/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 09/14/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/26/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 11/10/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/14/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 11/15/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/18/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/14/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 04/17/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/27/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/09/2012