Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/15/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/14/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/19/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/19/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/19/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/22/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/23/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/23/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/29/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/29/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/29/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/29/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/29/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 10/05/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/07/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/07/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/07/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/07/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 10/13/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 10/13/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 10/13/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/18/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/18/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/18/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/18/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/18/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/18/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/24/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/24/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/26/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 11/01/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/01/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 11/01/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/01/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 11/01/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 11/01/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/01/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/04/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/04/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 11/04/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 11/14/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/15/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/18/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 11/18/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/18/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/18/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/18/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/18/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 11/29/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/29/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/29/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/29/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/29/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 12/01/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 12/08/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/08/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/13/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/13/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 12/16/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/19/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 02/03/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 02/03/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/03/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/03/2012
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 02/03/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 02/06/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/07/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/09/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/09/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/13/2012
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/13/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/15/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/16/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 02/16/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 02/16/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/16/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/16/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/16/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 02/17/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/05/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/20/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/26/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 03/26/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/29/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/29/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 03/29/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 03/29/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/29/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/29/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/29/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/29/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/17/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/17/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 04/18/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/23/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/25/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/25/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 04/26/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/07/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/07/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/07/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/07/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/07/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/08/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/08/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/11/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/11/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/15/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/15/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/15/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 05/15/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/15/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/16/2012
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/17/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 05/17/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 05/17/2012
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/22/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 05/30/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 06/01/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/05/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/05/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/12/2012
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/12/2012
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/29/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/11/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 08/02/2012