Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/18/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/29/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/14/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 06/26/2012