Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/11/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/17/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/29/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/04/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/04/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/23/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/07/2011