Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 07/18/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/19/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/19/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/26/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 07/26/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/26/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/26/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/27/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/27/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 07/28/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 07/29/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 08/05/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 09/14/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/14/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 10/03/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/01/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/01/2011
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 11/15/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 11/15/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/15/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 11/15/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/15/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 11/15/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/15/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/15/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 11/16/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/17/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 11/18/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/29/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/29/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/29/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 12/16/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 06/28/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/09/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 07/31/2012