Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 07/19/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 07/19/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/19/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 07/19/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/20/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/20/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/20/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/20/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/20/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/20/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 07/20/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/21/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/22/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/22/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/25/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/25/2011