Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/21/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/21/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 07/21/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/21/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/21/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/21/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/21/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/21/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/21/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/21/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/21/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/21/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/21/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/21/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/21/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 07/21/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/21/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/21/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/21/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/25/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/25/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/25/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/27/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/27/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/28/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/07/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/08/2011