Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 07/20/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/28/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/28/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/28/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 07/28/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/28/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/28/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 08/01/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 08/01/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/06/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 10/06/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/06/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 10/06/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 10/06/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/06/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/06/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/06/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/06/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/06/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/06/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/06/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 10/06/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/06/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/06/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/06/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 10/06/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 10/25/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/04/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/04/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 11/04/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/04/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/04/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/04/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/04/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/06/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 12/06/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/06/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/29/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/29/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/07/2012