Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 01/11/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 01/11/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/20/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/20/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/20/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/08/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/28/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/30/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/30/2011