Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8]* 01/12/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/25/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/25/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 01/25/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 01/25/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/25/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/25/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 02/11/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/12/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/16/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/20/2012