Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/19/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/19/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/19/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/19/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/19/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/19/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/19/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/19/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/19/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/19/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/19/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/19/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/19/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/19/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/19/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/19/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/19/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/19/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/19/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/19/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/19/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/20/2011
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/26/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 01/26/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/26/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/26/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/09/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 02/18/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/10/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 08/01/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/19/2012