Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 07/25/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 07/25/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/25/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 07/25/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 07/25/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 07/25/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/25/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/08/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/04/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/15/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/16/2011