Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/07/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/07/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/14/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/06/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/03/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/03/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/01/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/18/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/27/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/18/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/13/2012