Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 07/25/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/25/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/25/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 08/09/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 08/12/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/14/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/16/2012