Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/01/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 08/12/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 08/12/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/07/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/07/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/07/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 10/14/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/29/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/09/2012