Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/27/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/27/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/27/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/27/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/27/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/27/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/27/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/28/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/28/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/28/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/28/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/28/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/28/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 07/28/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/28/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/29/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/29/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 07/29/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 08/01/2011