Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/26/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 08/26/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 08/26/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/09/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/23/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/23/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/23/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/23/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/23/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/23/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/23/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/23/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/06/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/06/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/06/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/06/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 10/06/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/06/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/06/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/06/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/06/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/14/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/14/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/14/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/14/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/14/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/14/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/01/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 11/01/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/01/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/01/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/01/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/01/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/01/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/03/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/18/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/18/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/18/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/30/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/08/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 12/08/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/12/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/06/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/06/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/19/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/19/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/22/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/24/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/24/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/24/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/24/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/06/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/06/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/07/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/12/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/19/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/19/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/27/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 06/28/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/09/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/09/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/09/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/11/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/19/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/19/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 07/24/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/24/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 08/01/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 08/02/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/10/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 09/10/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/14/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 11/16/2012