Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/26/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/26/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/20/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/20/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/20/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/20/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/20/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/20/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/20/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/20/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/05/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/26/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/26/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 11/03/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/15/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/25/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/27/2012