Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/28/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/28/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 07/28/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 10/13/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/13/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/13/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 10/13/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/31/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/31/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 10/31/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/31/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 11/01/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/01/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 11/14/2011