Refine your search

8 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
05/15/2012 Became Public Law No: 112-113.
05/15/2012 Signed by President.
05/14/2012 Presented to President.
05/08/2012 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2985-2986)
05/07/2012 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
12/14/2011 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 12/12/2011 H8329)
12/12/2011 Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 112-326.
07/27/2011 Introduced in House