Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 07/27/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 07/27/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/27/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 07/27/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 07/27/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 08/19/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 08/19/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/07/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/07/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/13/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/13/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/19/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/19/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/19/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 09/19/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/26/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 09/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/26/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/29/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/12/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/12/2011