Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/27/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/27/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/27/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/27/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 08/01/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 08/01/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/17/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/17/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 02/17/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/17/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/17/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/17/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/17/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/08/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/08/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 03/08/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 03/08/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/08/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/21/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/21/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/13/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 12/13/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/13/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/13/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/13/2012