Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 10/05/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 10/06/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/13/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/24/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/25/2011
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 10/25/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/15/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 11/18/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/18/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/29/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/02/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 12/06/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/13/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 12/13/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/16/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/16/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/16/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/27/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/29/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/09/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/10/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/11/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/25/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/31/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 08/01/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 08/01/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/10/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/12/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/13/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/13/2012