Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 07/27/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/29/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 08/01/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/05/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/08/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/08/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/08/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/09/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/13/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/14/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/21/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/22/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/23/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 10/12/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/12/2011
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/16/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 11/17/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/29/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/01/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/01/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 12/01/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/01/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 02/14/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/14/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/28/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/18/2012