Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 07/27/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/13/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/15/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/19/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/29/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/05/2011