Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/28/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 08/01/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/07/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/07/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/07/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/12/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/13/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/20/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/23/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/23/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/29/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/03/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/12/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/12/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/14/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/25/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/25/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/25/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/31/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/31/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 10/31/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/31/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/31/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/01/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/01/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/01/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/14/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/14/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/14/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/14/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 11/14/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/14/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/14/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/14/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/17/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 12/19/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/18/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/18/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/18/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/31/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/06/2012
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/08/2012
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/13/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/14/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/16/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/19/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/26/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/26/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/25/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/25/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/07/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/08/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/15/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/15/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/15/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/15/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/16/2012